Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Datus Hilarion Lega

Bishop of Manokwari-Sorong, Indonesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1956 Born
15 Jun 198427.6Ordained PriestPriest of Ruteng, Indonesia
30 Jun 200346.6AppointedBishop of Manokwari-Sorong, Indonesia
7 Sep 200346.8Ordained BishopBishop of Manokwari-Sorong, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Datus Hilarion Lega
Bishop Datus Hilarion Lega (born ) Bishop of Manokwari-Sorong

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKupang

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Manokwari-Sorong.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,453

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018