Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Memelauer

Deceased

Bishop of Sankt Pölten


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1874BornHehenberg
24 Jan 189722.3Ordained PriestPriest of Sankt Pölten, Austria
18 Apr 192752.6AppointedBishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria
26 May 192752.7Ordained BishopBishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria
30 Sep 196187.0DiedBishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria

MicroData Summary for Michael Memelauer:
Bishop Michael Memelauer (born , died ) Bishop of Sankt Pölten

  • a priest for 64.7 years
  • a bishop for 34.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1927, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013