Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz ˇak

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sankt Pölten


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jun 1917BornNiederedlitz
13 Jul 194730.0Ordained PriestPriest of Sankt Pölten, Austria
4 Dec 195639.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria
4 Dec 195639.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Apollonia
30 Dec 195639.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Apollonia
1 Oct 196144.3SucceededBishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria
8 May 196951.9AppointedBishop of Austria, Military
27 Sep 198568.2ResignedBishop of Austria, Military
11 Jul 199174.0RetiredBishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria
28 Jan 200486.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Sankt Pölten, Austria

MicroData Summary for Franz ˇak:
Bishop Franz ˇak (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sankt Pölten

  • a priest for 56.5 years
  • a bishop for 47.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 112
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013