Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Streidt

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria

Titular Bishop of Macri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1905Born
19 Jul 193126.3Ordained PriestPriest of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
3 Aug 195651.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
3 Aug 195651.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Macri
28 Oct 195651.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Macri
28 Jan 196155.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria

MicroData Summary for Joseph Streidt
Bishop Joseph Streidt (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWien

  • a priest for 29.5 years
  • a bishop for 4.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 96
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast