Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Carlo Cardinal Sacconi

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation of Ceremonies

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Pro-Datary of the Apostolic Datary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 May 1808Born
13 Nov 184739.5AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Bavaria
27 May 185143.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicaea
6 Jun 185143.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Bavaria
8 Jun 185143.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nicaea
28 Sep 185345.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to France
27 Sep 186153.3Elevated to Cardinal
27 Sep 186153.3ResignedApostolic Nuncio to France
30 Sep 186153.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo
20 Dec 186759.6AppointedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura
8 Oct 187062.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
2 Jun 187769.0AppointedPro-Datary of the Apostolic Datary
15 Jul 187870.1AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
24 Mar 188475.8AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
28 Mar 188475.8AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of Ceremonies
25 Feb 188980.7DiedPrefect of the Congregation of Ceremonies

MicroData Summary for Carlo Sacconi (VIAF: 72462995)
Carlo Cardinal Sacconi (born , died ) Prefect of Ceremonies

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontalto, Italy
Ordained BishopSs. Vincenzo ed Anastasio, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Campo Verano, Cemetery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Current)Family Tomb, Montalto, Diocese of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy

  • a bishop for 37.7 years
  • a cardinal for 27.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 411, and Page 44
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 50
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1851, Number 30
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 27 Sep 1861
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 55, and Page 127

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast