Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvatore Silvestri, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Conversano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Dec 1815Born
1 Nov 183317.8ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
1 Jul 183822.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
23 Feb 187256.1AppointedBishop of Conversano, Italy
25 Feb 187256.1Ordained BishopBishop of Conversano, Italy
14 Feb 1879³63.1DiedBishop of Conversano, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Salvatore Silvestri
Bishop Salvatore Silvestri C.SS.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Conversano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBisceglia, Diocese of Bisceglie
Ordained BishopSt. Alphonse, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 40.6 years
  • a bishop for 6.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 224
  • bd/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1872, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 1 Mar 2017