Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Folicaldi

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Ephesus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1822Born
25 Jul 184522.6Ordained PriestPriest
28 Jan 187653.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Amathus in Palaestina
6 Feb 187653.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amathus in Palaestina
12 Mar 187754.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ephesus
30 Oct 1883³60.9DiedTitular Archbishop of Ephesus

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Folicaldi
Archbishop Francesco Folicaldi (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Ephesus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBagnacavallo, Diocese of Faenza, Italy
Ordained BishopSt. Peter's, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 38.2 years
  • a bishop for 7.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: JPG
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 93, and Page 260
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1876, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Mar 2017