Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pietro Pace

Deceased

Bishop of Malta

Titular Archbishop of Rhodus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1831Born
17 Dec 185322.6Ordained PriestPriest
12 Mar 187745.9AppointedBishop of Gozo, Malta
8 Apr 187745.9Ordained BishopBishop of Gozo, Malta
2 Jul 187746.2InstalledBishop of Gozo, Malta
11 Feb 188957.8AppointedBishop of Malta
11 Feb 188957.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Rhodus
29 Jul 191483.3DiedBishop of Malta

MicroData Summary for Pietro Pace (VIAF: 234160031)
Archbishop Pietro Pace (born , died ) Bishop of Malta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRabat, Diocese of Gozo
Ordained BishopSan Carlo in Corso, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 60.6 years
  • a bishop for 37.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 283, and Page 378
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 248
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1877, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Mar 2017