Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Maria Camilleri, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Gozo, Malta

Titular Bishop of Methone


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1843Born
21 Dec 186724.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
11 Feb 188945.9AppointedBishop of Gozo, Malta
24 Feb 188945.9Ordained BishopBishop of Gozo, Malta
12 May 188946.1InstalledBishop of Gozo, Malta
21 Jan 192480.8RetiredBishop of Gozo, Malta
21 Jan 192480.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Methone
7 Dec 192582.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Gozo, Malta

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Maria Camilleri (VIAF: 89023178)
Bishop Giovanni Maria Camilleri O.E.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Gozo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Valletta, Diocese of Malta
Ordained BishopS. Augustin, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 57.9 years
  • a bishop for 36.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Number 14,991
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 283
  • d: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1889, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Jun 2017