Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvatore Gaffiero

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Malta

Titular Bishop of Selymbria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Mar 1828Born
20 Dec 185123.7Ordained PriestPriest of Malta
28 Nov 189870.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Malta
28 Nov 189870.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Selymbria
15 Jan 189970.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Selymbria
8 Dec 190678.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Malta

MicroData Summary for Salvatore Gaffiero
Bishop Salvatore Gaffiero (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Malta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSenglea, Diocese of Malta
Ordained PriestSt. John's, Co-Cathedral, Valletta, Diocese of Malta
Ordained BishopSt. John's, Co-Cathedral, Valletta, Diocese of Malta

  • a priest for 54.9 years
  • a bishop for 7.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 512
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1899, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Jun 2017