Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guglielmo Giosafat Giuseppe Pifferi, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Porphyreon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 May 1819BornAcquapendente
24 Mar 183919.8ProfessedMember of Order of St. Augustine
1 Dec 184122.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
14 Mar 188767.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Porphyreon
27 Mar 188767.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Porphyreon
29 Apr 191090.9DiedTitular Bishop of Porphyreon

MicroData Summary for Guglielmo Giosafat Giuseppe Pifferi:
Bishop Guglielmo Giosafat Giuseppe Pifferi O.S.A. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Porphyreon

  • a priest for 68.4 years
  • a bishop for 23.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 463

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013