Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paolo Schinosi

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Marcianopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1827Born
20 Sep 185124.4Ordained PriestPriest of Benevento, Italy
19 Apr 189770.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Benevento, Italy
19 Apr 189770.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Gaza
25 Apr 189770.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gaza
8 Apr 190174.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Marcianopolis
18 Jul 192194.2DiedTitular Archbishop of Marcianopolis

MicroData Summary for Paolo Schinosi
Archbishop Paolo Schinosi (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Marcianopolis

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBenevento, Archdiocese of Benevento, Italy
Ordained BishopSt. Augustin, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceBenevento, Archdiocese of Benevento, Italy

  • a priest for 69.8 years
  • a bishop for 24.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 283, and Page 366
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1897, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017