Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Ressia

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mondovi

Titular Bishop of Helenopolis in Bithynia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1850BornVigone
7 Jun 187322.7Ordained PriestPriest
19 Apr 189746.6AppointedBishop of Mondovi, Italy
25 Apr 189746.6Ordained BishopBishop of Mondovi, Italy
4 Jul 193281.8RetiredBishop of Mondovi, Italy
4 Jul 193281.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Helenopolis in Bithynia
4 Sep 193383.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Mondovi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Ressia:
Bishop Giovanni Battista Ressia (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mondovi

  • a priest for 60.2 years
  • a bishop for 36.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1934
  • op/ob: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 395

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013