Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Costanzo Castrale

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Torino {Turin}

Titular Bishop of Gaza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1850BornUsseglio, Italy
30 May 187424.4Ordained PriestPriest of Torino {Turin}, Italy
27 Mar 190555.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy
27 Mar 190555.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Gaza
7 May 190555.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gaza
26 Nov 193686.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Costanzo Castrale:
Bishop Costanzo Castrale (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Torino {Turin}

  • a priest for 62.5 years
  • a bishop for 31.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • op/ob: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1905, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013