Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claudio Angelo Giuseppe Calabrese

Deceased

Bishop of Aosta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1867BornFourneaux, France
21 Sep 188922.6Ordained PriestPriest of Susa, Italy
7 May 192053.2AppointedBishop of Aosta, Italy
11 Jul 192053.4Ordained BishopBishop of Aosta, Italy
7 May 193265.2DiedBishop of Aosta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Claudio Angelo Giuseppe Calabrese:
Bishop Claudio Angelo Giuseppe Calabrese (born , died ) Bishop of Aosta

  • a priest for 42.6 years
  • a bishop for 11.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1920, Number 43
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 73

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013