Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Albino Pella

Deceased

Bishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1865Born
24 Feb 188822.6Ordained PriestPriest of Biella, Italy
19 Aug 190843.1AppointedBishop of Calvi e Teano, Italy
11 Oct 190843.2Ordained BishopBishop of Calvi e Teano, Italy
12 Apr 191549.7AppointedBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy
17 May 194074.8DiedBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy

MicroData Summary for Albino Pella
Bishop Albino Pella (born , died ) Bishop of Casale Monferrato

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValdengo
Ordained BishopBiella, Diocese of Biella

  • a priest for 52.2 years
  • a bishop for 31.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,937
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,941
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,908, Number 64
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 115, and Page 105
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 8, Number 390
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 640, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast