Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Umberto Ugliengo

Deceased

Bishop of Susa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jul 1883BornValdengo
7 Jan 190622.5Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jun 193249.0AppointedBishop of Susa, Italy
14 Aug 193249.1Ordained BishopBishop of Susa, Italy
2 Oct 195370.3DiedBishop of Susa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Umberto Ugliengo:
Bishop Umberto Ugliengo (born , died ) Bishop of Susa

  • a priest for 47.7 years
  • a bishop for 21.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1932, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013