Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emiliano Manacorda

Deceased

Bishop of Fossano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Aug 1833Born
9 Apr 185925.6Ordained PriestPriest
24 Nov 187138.3AppointedBishop of Fossano, Italy
31 Dec 187138.4Ordained BishopBishop of Fossano, Italy
29 Jul 190975.9DiedBishop of Fossano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Emiliano Manacorda (VIAF: 89197073)
Bishop Emiliano Manacorda (born , died ) Bishop of Fossano

EventPlace
Birth PlacePenango, Diocese of Casale Monferrato
Ordained BishopSant'Apollinare, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 50.3 years
  • a bishop for 37.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 276
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,737
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1871, Number 77

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 May 2017