Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Igino Bandi

Deceased

Bishop of Tortona, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1847Born
24 Sep 187022.9Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jun 189042.7AppointedBishop of Tortona, Italy
14 Sep 189042.9Ordained BishopBishop of Tortona, Italy
8 Sep 191466.9DiedBishop of Tortona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Igino Bandi (VIAF: 90203431)
Bishop Igino Bandi (born , died ) Bishop of Tortona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZeme Lomellina, Diocese of Vigevano
Ordained BishopVigevano, Diocese of Vigevano

  • a priest for 43.9 years
  • a bishop for 23.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 242
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1890, Number 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 May 2017