Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ambrogio Daffra

Deceased

Bishop of Ventimiglia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jan 1841Born
17 Dec 186423.9Ordained PriestPriest
11 Jul 189251.5AppointedBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy
25 Sep 189251.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy
29 Jan 189352.0InstalledBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy
3 Aug 193291.5DiedBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ambrogio Daffra
Bishop Ambrogio Daffra (born , died ) Bishop of Ventimiglia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCanneto Pavese, Diocese of Tortona
Ordained BishopCathedral, Tortona, Diocese of Tortona

  • a priest for 67.6 years
  • a bishop for 39.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • op/ob: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 585
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1892, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Jun 2017