Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Carli

Deceased

Bishop of Luni, Sarzana e Brugnato, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1844Born
18 Sep 186925.6Ordained PriestPriest
24 Mar 189854.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Genova, Italy
24 Mar 189854.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Proconnesus
21 May 189854.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Proconnesus
19 Jun 189955.4AppointedBishop of Luni, Sarzana e Brugnato, Italy
5 Jan 192176.9DiedBishop of Luni, Sarzana e Brugnato, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Carli
Bishop Giovanni Carli (born , died ) Bishop of Luni, Sarzana e Brugnato

EventPlace
Birth PlaceColdirodi, Diocese of Ventimiglia
Ordained BishopCathedral, Genova, Archdiocese of Genova

  • a priest for 51.2 years
  • a bishop for 22.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 355, and Page 470
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1898, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Jun 2017