Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Allegro

Deceased

Bishop of Albenga, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1829Born
20 Sep 185122.2Ordained PriestPriest of Albenga, Italy
12 May 187949.8AppointedBishop of Albenga, Italy
22 May 187949.8Ordained BishopBishop of Albenga, Italy
2 Dec 191081.4DiedBishop of Albenga, Italy

MicroData Summary for Filippo Allegro (VIAF: 88974955)
Bishop Filippo Allegro (born , died ) Bishop of Albenga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCosta Bacelega, Diocese of Albenga
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 59.2 years
  • a bishop for 31.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 87
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,879, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast