Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Tommaso Reggio

Deceased

Archbishop of Genova


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1818BornGenova
18 Sep 184123.7Ordained PriestPriest
20 Mar 187759.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Ventimiglia, Italy
20 Mar 187759.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Tanis
6 May 187759.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tanis
26 Jun 187759.5SucceededBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy
11 Jul 189274.5AppointedArchbishop of Genova, Italy
22 Nov 190183.9DiedArchbishop of Genova, Italy

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Reggio:
Archbishop Tommaso Reggio (born , died ) Archbishop of Genova

  • a priest for 60.2 years
  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 316, and Page 534
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 585

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013