Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Cerruti

Deceased

Bishop of Savona e Noli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1813Born
19 Dec 183522.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Savona e Noli, Italy
23 Sep 183723.8Ordained PriestPriest of Savona e Noli, Italy
22 Feb 186753.2AppointedBishop of Savona e Noli, Italy
28 Apr 186753.4Ordained BishopBishop of Savona e Noli, Italy
21 Mar 187965.3DiedBishop of Savona e Noli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Cerruti (VIAF: 90219661)
Bishop Giovanni Battista Cerruti (born , died ) Bishop of Savona e Noli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVarazze, Diocese of Savona e Noli
Ordained BishopSs. Dominique et Sixte, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 41.4 years
  • a bishop for 11.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 500
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1867, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 Mar 2017