Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Maria Sciandra

Deceased

Bishop of Acqui, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Nov 1808Born
28 May 183122.5Ordained PriestPriest
27 Oct 187162.9AppointedBishop of Acqui, Italy
30 Nov 187163.0Ordained BishopBishop of Acqui, Italy
25 May 188879.5DiedBishop of Acqui, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Maria Sciandra
Bishop Giuseppe Maria Sciandra (born , died ) Bishop of Acqui

EventPlace
Birth PlacePamparato, Archdiocese of Monreale
Ordained BishopTorino, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}

  • a priest for 56.9 years
  • a bishop for 16.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 116, Number 10,331
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 114
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1871, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast