Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eugenio Roberto Galletti

Deceased

Bishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1816Born
22 Dec 183822.7Ordained PriestPriest
27 Mar 186751.0AppointedBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
26 May 186751.1Ordained BishopBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
5 Oct 187963.5DiedBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy

MicroData Summary for Eugenio Roberto Galletti (VIAF: 88811801)
Bishop Eugenio Roberto Galletti (born , died ) Bishop of Alba (Pompea)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTorino, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}
Ordained BishopCotolengo (Rosaire), Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}

  • a priest for 40.7 years
  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 85
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1867, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Mar 2017