Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Giocondo Salvai di Govone

Deceased

Bishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Apr 1815Born
23 Dec 183722.6Ordained PriestPriest
23 Dec 187257.6AppointedBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
2 Mar 187357.8Ordained BishopBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
1 Mar 189781.8DiedBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Giocondo Salvai di Govone
Bishop Pietro Giocondo Salvai di Govone (born , died ) Bishop of Alessandria (della Paglia)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCasale Monferrato, Diocese of Casale Monferrato
Ordained BishopAlba, Diocese of Alba (Pompea)

  • a priest for 59.1 years
  • a bishop for 23.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 88
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1873, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017