Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrea Formica

Deceased

Bishop of Cuneo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1812Born
20 May 183724.5Ordained PriestPriest
27 Mar 186754.4AppointedBishop of Cuneo, Italy
26 May 186754.6Ordained BishopBishop of Cuneo, Italy
9 Jun 186754.6InstalledBishop of Cuneo, Italy
5 Jan 188572.2DiedBishop of Cuneo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Andrea Formica (VIAF: 88668259)
Bishop Andrea Formica (born , died ) Bishop of Cuneo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastagnole delle Lanze, Diocese of Alba (Pompea)
Ordained BishopCotolengo (Rosaire), Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}

  • a priest for 47.6 years
  • a bishop for 17.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 234
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1867, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Feb 2017