Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Moreno

Deceased

Bishop of Ivrea, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jun 1800Born
24 May 182322.9Ordained PriestPriest
21 May 183837.9SelectedBishop of Ivrea, Italy
13 Sep 183838.2ConfirmedBishop of Ivrea, Italy
23 Sep 183838.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ivrea, Italy
4 May 187877.8DiedBishop of Ivrea, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Moreno (VIAF: 89233800)
Bishop Luigi Moreno (born , died ) Bishop of Ivrea

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMallare

  • a priest for 54.9 years
  • a bishop for 39.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 225
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1838, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast