Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph-Auguste-Melchior Duc

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Aosta, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Traianopolis in Rhodope


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1835Born
19 Dec 185722.8Ordained PriestPriest
29 Jul 187237.4AppointedBishop of Aosta, Italy
1 Sep 187237.5Ordained BishopBishop of Aosta, Italy
16 Dec 190772.8ResignedBishop of Aosta, Italy
16 Dec 190772.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Traianopolis in Rhodope
12 Dec 192287.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Aosta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Auguste-Melchior Duc (VIAF: 88619325)
Archbishop Joseph-Auguste-Melchior Duc (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Aosta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChâtillon, Diocese of Aosta
Ordained BishopCathedral, Aosta, Diocese of Aosta

  • a priest for 64.9 years
  • a bishop for 50.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1923
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 131
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1872, Number 93

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Mar 2017