Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Etienne-Barthélemy Bagnoud, C.R.A. †

Deceased

Abbot of Saint-Maurice

Titular Bishop of Bethleem


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1803BornIcone
182623.0ProfessedMember of Swiss Congregation of Canons Regular of Saint Maurice of Agaune
3 Sep 183431.6SelectedAbbot of Saint-Maurice, Switzerland
19 Dec 183431.9ConfirmedAbbot of Saint-Maurice, Switzerland
3 Jul 184037.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Bethleem
26 Jul 184037.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bethleem
2 Nov 188885.8DiedAbbot of Saint-Maurice, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Etienne-Barthélemy Bagnoud (VIAF: 315961923)
Bishop Etienne-Barthélemy Bagnoud C.R.A. (born , died ) Abbot of Saint-Maurice

  • a bishop for 48.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 110
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,639
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1840, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 28 Nov 2016