Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Moritz-Fabian Roten

Deceased

Bishop of Sion {Sitten}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Apr 1783BornRaron
21 Sep 180724.4Ordained PriestPriest of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
18 Mar 183046.9SelectedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
5 Jul 183047.2ConfirmedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
24 Aug 183047.3Ordained BishopBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
11 Aug 184360.3DiedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Moritz-Fabian Roten (VIAF: 103466170)
Bishop Moritz-Fabian Roten (born , died ) Bishop of Sion {Sitten}

  • a priest for 35.8 years
  • a bishop for 12.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 340
  • ob/c3: CB, 28 Nov 2015
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,636
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1830, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 18 Oct 2016