Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter-Josef de Preux

Deceased

Bishop of Sion {Sitten}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Apr 1795³BornAnchet
6 Apr 182226.9Ordained PriestPriest of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
12 Dec 184348.6SelectedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
25 Jan 184448.7ConfirmedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
30 Jun 184449.2Ordained BishopBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
15 Jul 187580.2DiedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Peter-Josef de Preux:
Bishop Peter-Josef de Preux (born , died ) Bishop of Sion {Sitten}

  • a priest for 53.3 years
  • a bishop for 31.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 340

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013