Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Eugène Amable Jean Claude Lachat, C.Pp.S. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Basel

Titular Archbishop of Tamiathis

Apostolic Administrator of Lugano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1819BornMontavon
183717.2ProfessedMember of Society of Precious Blood
18 Dec 184122.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Society of Precious Blood
24 Sep 184222.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Precious Blood
26 Feb 186343.4SelectedBishop of Basel, Switzerland
28 Sep 186344.0ConfirmedBishop of Basel, Switzerland
30 Nov 186344.1Ordained BishopBishop of Basel, Switzerland
18 Dec 188465.2ResignedBishop of Basel, Switzerland
23 Mar 188565.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tamiathis
23 Mar 188565.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Lugano, Switzerland
1 Nov 188667.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Basel, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Eugène Amable Jean Claude Lachat:
Archbishop Eugène Amable Jean Claude Lachat C.Pp.S. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Basel

  • a priest for 44.1 years
  • a bishop for 22.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 156, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 142, and Page 239

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013