Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karl Johann Greith

Deceased

Bishop of Sankt Gallen


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1807BornRapperswil
2 Apr 183123.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland
28 May 183124.0Ordained PriestPriest of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland
11 Sep 186255.3SelectedBishop of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland
16 Mar 186355.8ConfirmedBishop of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland
3 May 186355.9Ordained BishopBishop of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland
17 May 188275.0DiedBishop of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Karl Johann Greith:
Bishop Karl Johann Greith (born , died ) Bishop of Sankt Gallen

  • a priest for 51.0 years
  • a bishop for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 499

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013