Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vinzenz Gasser

Deceased

Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1809Born
28 Jul 183323.7Ordained PriestPriest of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
8 Oct 185646.9SelectedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
15 Dec 185647.1ConfirmedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
8 Mar 185747.3Ordained BishopBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
6 Apr 187969.4DiedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vinzenz Gasser (VIAF: 15575624)
Bishop Vinzenz Gasser (born , died ) Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGfas, Diocese of Brixen {Bressanone}
Ordained BishopBrixen, Diocese of Brixen {Bressanone}

  • a priest for 45.6 years
  • a bishop for 22.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 159
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1857, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 4 Feb 2017