Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Nepomucene Amberg

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy

Titular Bishop of Europus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1802Born
12 Sep 182422.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
19 Dec 182422.8Ordained PriestPriest of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
25 Sep 186563.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
25 Sep 186563.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Europus
19 Nov 186563.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Europus
16 Mar 188280.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Johann Nepomucene Amberg
Bishop Johann Nepomucene Amberg (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceInnsbruck, Diocese of Brixen {Bressanone}
Ordained BishopBrixen, Diocese of Brixen {Bressanone}

  • a priest for 57.2 years
  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 266
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1865, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 26 Mar 2017