Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karl Franz von Lodron

Deceased

Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Nov 1748BornInnsbruck
25 May 177122.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
21 Dec 177123.0Ordained PriestPriest of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
16 Aug 179142.7SelectedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
27 Feb 179243.2ConfirmedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
25 Mar 179243.3Ordained BishopBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
10 Aug 182879.7DiedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Karl Franz von Lodron
Bishop Karl Franz von Lodron (born , died ) Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}

  • a priest for 56.6 years
  • a bishop for 36.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 35
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 131

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 21 Feb 2016