Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bl. Johann Nepomuk von Tschiderer zu Gleitheim

Deceased

Bishop of Trento


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1777³BornBolzano
24 Jun 180023.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Trento, Italy
27 Jul 180023.2Ordained PriestPriest of Trento, Italy
24 Feb 183254.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
24 Feb 183254.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Helenopolis in Bithynia
20 May 183255.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Helenopolis in Bithynia
17 Jul 183457.2SelectedBishop of Trento, Italy
19 Dec 183457.6ConfirmedBishop of Trento, Italy
3 Dec 186083.6DiedBishop of Trento, Italy
30 Apr 1995Beatified

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bl. Johann Nepomuk von Tschiderer zu Gleitheim:
Bishop Bl. Johann Nepomuk von Tschiderer zu Gleitheim (born , died ) Bishop of Trento

  • a priest for 60.3 years
  • a bishop for 28.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 211, and Page 377
  • c01: CB, 9 Aug 2015
  • odd/opd: CB, 11 Aug 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 13 Aug 2015