Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Baptist Zwerger

Deceased

Bishop of Seckau


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jun 1824BornAlrei, Italy
14 Dec 185127.5Ordained PriestPriest of Trento, Italy
14 Aug 186743.1SelectedBishop of Seckau, Austria
12 Oct 186743.3ConfirmedBishop of Seckau, Austria
13 Oct 186743.3Ordained BishopBishop of Seckau, Austria
10 Nov 186743.4InstalledBishop of Seckau, Austria
14 Aug 189369.1DiedBishop of Seckau, Austria

MicroData Summary for Johann Baptist Zwerger:
Bishop Johann Baptist Zwerger (born , died ) Bishop of Seckau

  • a priest for 41.7 years
  • a bishop for 25.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 508

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013