Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Johannes Baptist Cardinal Katschthaler

Deceased

Archbishop of Salzburg

Cardinal-Priest of San Tommaso in Parione


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 May 1832BornHippach
31 Jul 185523.2Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
4 Jun 189159.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Salzburg, Austria
4 Jun 189159.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Cybistra
12 Jul 189159.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cybistra
10 May 190067.9SelectedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
17 Dec 190068.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
13 Jan 190168.6InstalledArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
22 Jun 190371.1Elevated to Cardinal
12 Nov 190371.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Tommaso in Parione
27 Feb 191481.7DiedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria

MicroData Summary for Johannes Baptist Katschthaler:
Cardinal Johannes Baptist Katschthaler (born , died ) Archbishop of Salzburg

  • a priest for 58.6 years
  • a bishop for 22.6 years
  • a cardinal for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 236, and Page 493
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 53
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Jun 1903

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013