Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Henry Leo Schlarman

Deceased

Bishop of Peoria, Illinois


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1879BornBresse Township
29 Jun 190425.3Ordained PriestPriest of Belleville, Illinois, USA
16 Apr 193051.1AppointedBishop of Peoria, Illinois, USA
17 Jun 193051.3Ordained BishopBishop of Peoria, Illinois, USA
24 Jun 193051.3InstalledBishop of Peoria, Illinois, USA
27 Jun 195172.3AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Peoria, Illinois, USA
10 Nov 195172.7DiedBishop of Peoria, Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Henry Leo Schlarman:
Archbishop Joseph Henry Leo Schlarman (born , died ) Bishop of Peoria

  • a priest for 47.4 years
  • a bishop for 21.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1930, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013