Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward William O’Rourke

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Peoria, Illinois


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Oct 1917BornDowns, IL
28 May 194426.6Ordained PriestPriest of Peoria, Illinois, USA
24 May 197153.6AppointedBishop of Peoria, Illinois, USA
15 Jul 197153.7Ordained BishopBishop of Peoria, Illinois, USA
22 Jan 199072.2RetiredBishop of Peoria, Illinois, USA
29 Sep 199981.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Peoria, Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for Edward William O’Rourke:
Bishop Edward William O’Rourke (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Peoria

  • a priest for 55.3 years
  • a bishop for 28.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013