Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Saint Cloud

Dioecesis Sancti Clodoaldi



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Donald Joseph Kettler, Bishop
  • John Francis Kinney, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 22 September 1889
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Saint Paul and Minneapolis
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Minnesota
  • Country: United States of America
  • Square Kilometers: 31,730 (12,251 Square Miles)
  • Description: Stearns, Sherburne, Benton, Morrison, Millelacs, Kennebec, Isanti, Pope, Stevens, Traverse, Grant, Douglas, Wilkin, Otter Tail, Todd, and Wadena Counties.
  • Conference Region: VIII (MN, ND, SD)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: SCL
  • Official Web Site: http://www.stcdio.org/
  • Mailing Address: Diocesan Chancery, P.O. Box 1248, 214 Third Ave. South, Saint Cloud, MN 56302
  • Telephone: (320)251-2340
  • Fax: 251-0740

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Minnesota
12 February 1875ErectedDiocese of Saint Paul Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Minnesota (erected)
3 October 1889Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Northern Minnesota Diocese of Duluth (erected)
Diocese of Saint Cloud
22 September 1889ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Northern Minnesota (Name changed and Vicariate raised to a Diocese) Diocese of Saint Cloud (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Saint Cloud
195090,882321,46528.3%157281854913091,252139ap1951
1966139,241330,02142.2%1891603493981261,540147ap1967
1970145,3471691653344352471,425137ap1971
1976145,347349,85341.5%15215530747312291,153139ap1977
1980154,000360,00042.8%1441482925275230871147ap1981
1990151,116442,00034.2%14512226756524213675144ap1991
1999148,243474,54631.2%1381392775353769674140ap2000
2000147,577480,37530.7%13111624759736193660139ap2001
2001147,047488,18130.1%13211624859235202648139ap2002
2002147,849499,10329.6%12311123463137196633138ap2003
2003148,466440,70133.7%13211424660340198609138ap2004
2004147,748516,75528.6%11610922565644178585138ap2005
2010142,576558,89025.5%11510321865448159464135ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 10 Nov 2013