Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sylvester William Treinen

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Boise City, Idaho, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1917Born
11 Jun 194628.5Ordained PriestPriest of Bismarck, North Dakota, USA
19 May 196244.5AppointedBishop of Boise City, Idaho, USA
25 Jul 196244.6Ordained BishopBishop of Boise City, Idaho, USA
3 Aug 196244.7InstalledBishop of Boise City, Idaho, USA
17 Aug 198870.7RetiredBishop of Boise City, Idaho, USA
30 Sep 199678.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Boise City, Idaho, USA

MicroData Summary for Sylvester William Treinen
Bishop Sylvester William Treinen (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Boise City

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDonelly, MN

  • a priest for 50.3 years
  • a bishop for 34.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1,962, Number 102

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast