Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hilary Baumann Hacker

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bismarck, North Dakota, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1913Born
4 Jun 193825.4Ordained PriestPriest
29 Dec 195643.9AppointedBishop of Bismarck, North Dakota, USA
27 Feb 195744.1Ordained BishopBishop of Bismarck, North Dakota, USA
28 Jun 198269.4ResignedBishop of Bismarck, North Dakota, USA
6 Nov 199077.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Bismarck, North Dakota, USA

MicroData Summary for Hilary Baumann Hacker
Bishop Hilary Baumann Hacker (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bismarck

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew Ulm

  • a priest for 52.4 years
  • a bishop for 33.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast