Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Saint Paul and Minneapolis

Archidioecesis Paulopolitanus et Minneapolitanus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • John Clayton Nienstedt, Archbishop
  • Andrew Harmon Cozzens, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Lee Anthony Piché, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Harry Joseph Flynn, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Name Changed: 11 July 1966
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Minnesota
  • Country: United States of America
  • Square Kilometers: 17,225 (6,187 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: VIII (MN, ND, SD)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: STP
  • Official Web Site: http://www.archspm.org/
  • Mailing Address: 226 Summit Ave., Saint Paul, MN 55102, USA
  • Telephone: (651)291-4400
  • Fax: 290-1629

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Saint Paul
19 July 1850ErectedDiocese of Dubuque
Diocese of Milwaukee
Diocese of Saint Paul (erected)
12 February 1875Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Saint Paul (From St. Louis to Milwaukee)
12 February 1875Territory LostDiocese of Saint Paul Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Minnesota (erected)
12 August 1879Territory LostDiocese of Saint Paul Vicariate Apostolic of Dakota (erected)
26 November 1889Territory LostDiocese of Saint Paul Diocese of Winona (erected)
Archdiocese of Saint Paul
4 May 1888ElevatedDiocese of Saint Paul Archdiocese of Saint Paul
31 December 1909Territory LostArchdiocese of Saint Paul Diocese of Crookston (erected) (Becker, Beltrami, Clay, Clearwater, Hubbard, Kittson, Marshall, Mahnomen, Norman, Pennington, Polk, Red Lake, and Rosseau Counties.)
18 November 1957Territory LostArchdiocese of Saint Paul Diocese of New Ulm (erected)
Archdiocese of Saint Paul and Minneapolis
11 July 1966Name ChangedArchdiocese of Saint Paul Archdiocese of Saint Paul and Minneapolis

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Saint Paul
1950335,8801,406,36523.9%475825576031311,976309ap1951
Archdiocese of Saint Paul and Minneapolis
1966508,4291,660,58030.6%4611786397954662,347224ap1967
1968525,4271,660,58031.6%4191465659293991,951203ap1971
1976517,8132,017,22525.7%3891675569312651,103214ap1977
1980554,6622,073,00026.8%377187564983412741,642217ap1981
1990642,3832,450,45926.2%3791495281,2161232241,434224ap1991
1999752,3252,757,98927.3%3451555001,504174531,090222ap2000
2000759,6622,792,06427.2%3701585281,4381712081,094222ap2001
2001769,1352,831,93127.2%3861605461,4081732121,090222ap2002
2002785,5842,899,36127.1%3491705191,513190215968222ap2003
2003786,1492,940,38226.7%3741725461,439207219936221ap2004
2004730,9892,949,64324.8%3471284751,538195193991220ap2005
2010825,0003,177,20726.0%328934211,959193139712216ap2011
2012839,0003,231,00026.0%360844441,889214142635200ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_d, v3.0.1, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 5 Nov 2014