Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lee Anthony Piché

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota

Titular Bishop of Tamata


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1958 BornMinneapolis
26 May 198426.0Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota, USA
27 May 200951.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota, USA
27 May 200951.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Tamata
29 Jun 200951.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tamata
15 Jun 201557.1ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota, USA

MicroData Summary for Lee Anthony Piché:
Bishop Lee Anthony Piché (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Saint Paul and Minneapolis

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Saint Paul and Minneapolis.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 May 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,198
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Jun 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 15 Jun 2015