Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul David Sirba

Deceased

Bishop of Duluth, Minnesota, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Sep 1960Born
31 May 198625.7Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota, USA
15 Oct 200949.1AppointedBishop of Duluth, Minnesota, USA
14 Dec 200949.2Ordained BishopBishop of Duluth, Minnesota, USA
1 Dec 201959.2DiedBishop of Duluth, Minnesota, USA

MicroData Summary for Paul David Sirba
Bishop Paul David Sirba (born , died ) Bishop of Duluth

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMinneapolis, MN, Archdiocese of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota
Ordained BishopDuluth Entertainment Convention Center Auditorium, Duluth, Diocese of Duluth, Minnesota
Death PlaceDuluth, Diocese of Duluth, Minnesota
Buried Place (Original)Calvary, Cemetery, Duluth, Diocese of Duluth, Minnesota

  • a priest for 33.5 years
  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Oct 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Number 16,328
  • d: CB, 1 Dec 2019
  • loc: CB, 3 Dec 2019
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast