Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Detroit

Archidioecesis Detroitensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Allen Henry Vigneron, Archbishop
  • Michael Jude Byrnes, Auxiliary Bishop
  • José Arturo Cepeda Escobedo, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Donald Francis Hanchon, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Francis Ronald Reiss, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Adam Joseph Maida, Cardinal, Archbishop Emeritus
  • Thomas John Gumbleton, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 22 May 1937
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Michigan
  • Country: United States of America
  • Square Kilometers: 10,106 (3,901 Square Miles)
  • Description: Monroe, Wayne, Oakland, St. Clair, Macomb, and Lapeer Counties.
  • Conference Region: VI (OH, MI)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: DET
  • Official Web Site: http://www.aodonline.org/
  • Mailing Address: 1234 Washington Blvd., Detroit, MI 48226
  • Telephone: (313)237-5816
  • Fax: 237-4642

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Detroit
8 March 1833ErectedDiocese of Cincinnati Diocese of Detroit (erected) (Michigan, Wisconsin, Minnesota, and the Dakotas east of the Mississippi River)
28 November 1843Territory LostDiocese of Detroit Diocese of Milwaukee (erected)
29 July 1853Territory LostDiocese of Detroit Vicariate Apostolic of Upper Michigan (erected)
19 May 1882Territory LostDiocese of Detroit Diocese of Grand Rapids (erected)
22 May 1937Territory LostDiocese of Detroit Diocese of Lansing (erected)
Archdiocese of Detroit
22 May 1937ElevatedDiocese of Detroit Archdiocese of Detroit
26 February 1938Territory LostArchdiocese of Detroit
Diocese of Grand Rapids
Diocese of Saginaw (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Detroit
1908256,500193442371,082146ce
Archdiocese of Detroit
1950900,0003,113,50328.9%5882858731,0303653,608236ap1951
19661,510,0004,850,00031.1%8235201,3431,1247144,590347ap1967
19681,598,4174,958,00032.2%7636101,3731,1648274,405345ap1971
19761,509,2774,527,83033.3%6443601,0041,503545113,151339ap1977
19801,190,0424,425,80026.9%6143759891,203935613,050344ap1981
19901,494,0004,238,90035.2%5203008201,8211564612,159308ap1991
19991,453,7564,266,65034.1%4953088031,8101471071,890306ap2000
20001,443,6514,266,65433.8%5613358961,6111474791,909313ap2001
20011,443,6514,266,65133.8%4872947811,8481464331,900308ap2002
20021,465,9184,441,55133.0%4813007811,8761474301,911310ap2003
20031,432,7344,441,55132.3%4743398131,7621454691,871310ap2004
20041,481,8664,441,55133.4%5052337382,0071523591,897309ap2005
20061,469,0004,523,00032.5%4772176942,1161593141,713303ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 1 Oct 2014